This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 21:04:53 (UTC).

DYER, CHARISSE MICHELE, NOLAN, RHONDA SUE Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 DYER, CHARISSE MICHELE, NOLAN, RHONDA SUE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DYER, CHARISSE MICHELE

Decedent

NOLAN, RHONDA SUE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $4.00 Receipt Number H 702805

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $4.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DTD 092520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCOPY IRS DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURE EMPLOYER ID NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE HERNANDO HMA INC PENSION PLAN AND TRUST AGREEENT SUMMARY OF BENEFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH RHONDA SUE NOLAN ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number H 699517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CP001022CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less