This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 08/08/2020 at 06:55:45 (UTC).

DOTSON, DEBRA VS HERNANDO COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 DOTSON, DEBRA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HERNANDO COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOTSON, DEBRA

Defendant

HERNANDO COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMIREZ, TRACY ANN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SECOND - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

04/01/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SECOND - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ON 052720 OF GREG HOUSEMAN (MINOR) AT 11:00; DEBRA DOTSON AT 1:30 AND GREG HOUSEMAN AT 3:00 FILED BY DEF

03/10/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ON 052720 OF GREG HOUSEMAN (MINOR) AT 11:00; DEBRA DOTSON AT 1:30 AND GREG HOUSEMAN AT 3:00 FILED BY DEF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES OF PLNTF DATED 012120 (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

03/03/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES OF PLNTF DATED 012120 (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFED ANSWERS TO PLNTFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGS FILED BY DEF

03/03/2020:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFED ANSWERS TO PLNTFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGS FILED BY DEF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF

02/26/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (UNVERIFIED) FILED BY DEF

02/26/2020:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (UNVERIFIED) FILED BY DEF

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY DEF FILED BY PLNTF

02/21/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY DEF FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

02/21/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION (FIRST) FILED BY DEF

01/22/2020:CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION (FIRST) FILED BY DEF

SUBPOENA FOR DEPO TO SHARON JOHNSON FILED BY PLNTF

07/02/2020:SUBPOENA FOR DEPO TO SHARON JOHNSON FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF SHARON JOHNSON ON 081920 AT 1:30 FILED BY PLNTF

07/02/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF SHARON JOHNSON ON 081920 AT 1:30 FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NATALIE RENE EDIE ON 081920 AT 2:30 FILED BY PLNTF

07/02/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NATALIE RENE EDIE ON 081920 AT 2:30 FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF SHANNON HESS ON 081920 AT 11:30 FILED BY PLNTF

07/02/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF SHANNON HESS ON 081920 AT 11:30 FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF OCTAVIO RUBERT ON 081920 AT 10:30 FILED BY PLNTF

07/02/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF OCTAVIO RUBERT ON 081920 AT 10:30 FILED BY PLNTF

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION (FIFTH) FILED BY DEF

06/16/2020:CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION (FIFTH) FILED BY DEF

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION (FOURTH) FILED BY DEF

06/09/2020:CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION (FOURTH) FILED BY DEF

REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF OF ANY AND ALL RECORDS RECEIVED PURSUANT TO NTC OF PROD FROM NON-PARTY UNDER CERT OF SERVICE DATE 060420 FILED BY PLNTF

06/04/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF OF ANY AND ALL RECORDS RECEIVED PURSUANT TO NTC OF PROD FROM NON-PARTY UNDER CERT OF SERVICE DATE 060420 FILED BY PLNTF

SUPPLEMENTAL - RESPONSE TO PLNTFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEF

03/13/2020:SUPPLEMENTAL - RESPONSE TO PLNTFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEF

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA FOR DEPO TO NATALIE RENE EDIE FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA FOR DEPO TO SHARON JOHNSON FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF SHARON JOHNSON ON 081920 AT 1:30 FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NATALIE RENE EDIE ON 081920 AT 2:30 FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF KELLY BAKER ON 081920 AT 12:30 FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF SHANNON HESS ON 081920 AT 11:30 FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF OCTAVIO RUBERT ON 081920 AT 10:30 FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION (FIFTH) FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION (FOURTH) FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF OF ANY AND ALL RECORDS RECEIVED PURSUANT TO NTC OF PROD FROM NON-PARTY UNDER CERT OF SERVICE DATE 060420 FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEFENDANT HERNANDO COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS Service@TonerRamirez.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED HERNANDO COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001372CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRACY A RAMIREZ