This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/02/2022 at 16:33:07 (UTC).

DOE, JANE VS FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 DOE, JANE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD E and SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE, JANE

Defendants

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN

KIDS CENTRAL INC

YOUTH AND FAMILY ALTERNATIVES

LIFE STREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER

Not Classified By Court

C.M., A MINOR

A.M., A MINOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINKLEMAN, MICHAEL ALAN

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

05/04/2022:COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

05/04/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR KIDS CENTRAL INC, A NOT FOR PROFIT FLORIDA CORPORATION (BLANK)

05/04/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR KIDS CENTRAL INC, A NOT FOR PROFIT FLORIDA CORPORATION (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER (BLANK)

05/04/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILY SERVICES (BLANK)

05/04/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILY SERVICES (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR YOUTH & FAMILY ALTERNATIVES INC, A NOT FOR PROFIT FLORIDA CORPORATION (BLANK)

05/04/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR YOUTH & FAMILY ALTERNATIVES INC, A NOT FOR PROFIT FLORIDA CORPORATION (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER

05/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KIDS CENTRAL INC.

05/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KIDS CENTRAL INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILY SERVICES

05/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILY SERVICES

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: YOUTH & FAMILY ALTERNATIVES, INC.

05/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: YOUTH & FAMILY ALTERNATIVES, INC.

SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA AMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO AOSC21-17

05/05/2022:SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA AMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO AOSC21-17

ADMIN ORDER A-2021-58 DTD 120121

05/05/2022:ADMIN ORDER A-2021-58 DTD 120121

ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

05/05/2022:ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

AMENDED ADMIN ORDER A-2021-52-A DTD 110521

05/05/2022:AMENDED ADMIN ORDER A-2021-52-A DTD 110521

HIGH PRIORITY NOTICE

05/05/2022:HIGH PRIORITY NOTICE

ADMIN ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURES FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFF 022820 AMENDED 051222 DTD 051222

05/13/2022:ADMIN ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURES FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFF 022820 AMENDED 051222 DTD 051222

ADMIN ORDER A-2021-13 DTD 042921

05/05/2022:ADMIN ORDER A-2021-13 DTD 042921

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketADMIN ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURES FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFF 022820 AMENDED 051222 DTD 051222

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketHIGH PRIORITY NOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED ADMIN ORDER A-2021-52-A DTD 110521

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketADMIN ORDER A-2021-58 DTD 120121

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketADMIN ORDER A-2021-13 DTD 042921

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA AMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO AOSC21-17

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: YOUTH & FAMILY ALTERNATIVES, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILY SERVICES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KIDS CENTRAL INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
05/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER (BLANK)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR KIDS CENTRAL INC, A NOT FOR PROFIT FLORIDA CORPORATION (BLANK)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2022

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $40.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2022

DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 791017

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2022

DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2022

DocketCase 272022CA000425CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/4/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less