Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/24/2021 at 18:23:00 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS MACNEIL, LISA MARIE

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MACNEIL, LISA MARIE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT and HITZEMANN, KURT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

HITZEMANN, KURT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendants

MACNEIL, LISA MARIE

MACNEIL, LISA

Spring Hill, FL 34608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

03/01/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $7621.72

03/01/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $7621.72

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO LISA MACNEIL (BLANK)

03/01/2021:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO LISA MACNEIL (BLANK)

COVER SHEET

03/01/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON: LISA MACNEIL 031521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: LISA MACNEIL - PTC 050621 9:30AM CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 723661

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO LISA MACNEIL (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $7621.72

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC000494SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J