This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/05/2019 at 16:16:44 (UTC).

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPA VS ARDITO, KORBY GIOVANNI Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARDITO, KORBY GIOVANNI. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPA

Defendants

WHITTED, GERRY

WHITTED, GAIL

ARDITO, KORBY GIOVANNI

HERNANDO HMA LLC

Not Classified By Court

SPRING HILL REGIONAL HOSPITAL

BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

SAVAGE, ROBERT KEVIN

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

08/12/2019:COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED HERNANDO HMA, LLC, D/B/A BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL, (BLANK)

08/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED HERNANDO HMA, LLC, D/B/A BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL, (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED GERRY WHITTED (BLANK)

08/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED GERRY WHITTED (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED GAIL WHITTED (BLANK)

08/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED GAIL WHITTED (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED KORBY GIOVANNI ARDITO (BLANK)

08/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED KORBY GIOVANNI ARDITO (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: HERNANDO HMA, LLC, D/B/A BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL

08/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: HERNANDO HMA, LLC, D/B/A BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GERRY WHITTED

08/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GERRY WHITTED

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GAIL WHITTED

08/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GAIL WHITTED

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KORBY GIOVANNI ARDITO

08/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KORBY GIOVANNI ARDITO

COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBTEDNESS

08/12/2019:COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBTEDNESS

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL 081519

08/27/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL 081519

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON KORBY GIOVANNI ARDITO (SUBST SERVED TO MARIA ARDITO) 081619

08/29/2019:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON KORBY GIOVANNI ARDITO (SUBST SERVED TO MARIA ARDITO) 081619

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON GAIL WHITTED (SUBST SERVED TO GERRY WHITTED) 082219

08/29/2019:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON GAIL WHITTED (SUBST SERVED TO GERRY WHITTED) 082219

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON GERRY WHITTED 082219

08/29/2019:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON GERRY WHITTED 082219

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEFS, WHITTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY GAIL WHITTED AND GERRY WHITTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON GERRY WHITTED 082219

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON GAIL WHITTED (SUBST SERVED TO GERRY WHITTED) 082219

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON KORBY GIOVANNI ARDITO (SUBST SERVED TO MARIA ARDITO) 081619

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL 081519

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KORBY GIOVANNI ARDITO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GAIL WHITTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GERRY WHITTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: HERNANDO HMA, LLC, D/B/A BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $440.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED KORBY GIOVANNI ARDITO (BLANK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED GAIL WHITTED (BLANK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED GERRY WHITTED (BLANK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED HERNANDO HMA, LLC, D/B/A BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL, (BLANK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $440.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA000908CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPRING HILL REGIONAL HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant