Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 21:05:39 (UTC).

DINARDO, ANN M, ROBINSON BERRY, DEBRA Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 DINARDO, ANN M, ROBINSON BERRY, DEBRA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

ROBINSON BERRY, DEBRA

Decedent

DINARDO, ANN M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Decedent Attorney

GERMANN, AMANDA J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION TO CREDITORS NOTICE TO CREDITORS 4/18/21 4/25/21 (TAMPA BAY TIMES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 04/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DTD 04/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE: CONSOLIDATION PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH OF ANN M. DINARDO ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $15.00 Receipt Number H 729636

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $15.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY ANN M DINARDO (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH ANN M DINARDO (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000451CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH ANN M DINARDO (COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ANN M DINARDO (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDEPOSIT/RECEIPT OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000186CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GERMANN, AMANDA J.