This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/02/2021 at 04:06:35 (UTC).

DIAZ, ERIN Et Al VS DOE 1, JOHN Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 DIAZ, ERIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 1, JOHN. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DIAZ, ERIN

DIAZ, JEFFREY

Defendants

WALMART INC

NULEAF PEST CONTROL AND HORTIC

DOE 1, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIGLIO, RICHARD DAVID

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (FIRST - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEFS

09/21/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (FIRST - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEFS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS AND INCORPORATED INTERROGS OF DEF WAL-MART INC FILED BY PLNTFS

09/15/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS AND INCORPORATED INTERROGS OF DEF WAL-MART INC FILED BY PLNTFS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE RE SOCIAL MEDIA TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

09/10/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE RE SOCIAL MEDIA TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

09/10/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC RE MEDICARE & SOCIAL SECURITY DISABILITY REPORTING TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

09/10/2021:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC RE MEDICARE & SOCIAL SECURITY DISABILITY REPORTING TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND INCORPORATED INTERROGS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

09/10/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND INCORPORATED INTERROGS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY RE SOCIAL MEDIA TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

09/10/2021:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY RE SOCIAL MEDIA TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY RE PREMISES LIABILITY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

09/10/2021:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY RE PREMISES LIABILITY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY RE MEDICARE & SOCIAL SECURITY DISABILITY REPORTING TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

09/10/2021:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY RE MEDICARE & SOCIAL SECURITY DISABILITY REPORTING TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

MOTION TO DISMISS DEF JOHN DOE NO 1

09/01/2021:MOTION TO DISMISS DEF JOHN DOE NO 1

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

09/01/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS jec@bolin-law.com FILED BY DEF WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

09/01/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS jec@bolin-law.com FILED BY DEF WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED NULEAF PEST CONTROL & HORTICULTURE SERVICES INC 081621

08/17/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED NULEAF PEST CONTROL & HORTICULTURE SERVICES INC 081621

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON WAL-MART INC 081121

08/12/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON WAL-MART INC 081121

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: WALMART INC

08/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: WALMART INC

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NULEAF PEST CONTROL & HORTICULTURE SERVICE INC

08/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NULEAF PEST CONTROL & HORTICULTURE SERVICE INC

ORDER EST AND IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM -DTD 042921

07/14/2021:ORDER EST AND IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM -DTD 042921

ADMIN NOTICE

07/14/2021:ADMIN NOTICE

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (FIRST - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS AND INCORPORATED INTERROGS OF DEF WAL-MART INC FILED BY PLNTFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE RE SOCIAL MEDIA TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC RE MEDICARE & SOCIAL SECURITY DISABILITY REPORTING TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND INCORPORATED INTERROGS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY RE SOCIAL MEDIA TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY RE PREMISES LIABILITY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY RE MEDICARE & SOCIAL SECURITY DISABILITY REPORTING TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF WAL-MART INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS DEF JOHN DOE NO 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WAL-MART INC ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO NULEAF PEST CONTROL & HORTICULTURE SERVICES, INC ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000566CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/9/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIGLIO , RICHARD DAVID