This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/13/2021 at 23:40:32 (UTC).

DIAZ, DARYANIS Et Al VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 DIAZ, DARYANIS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DIAZ, DARYANIS

VALDES, ISRAEL

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

URBANO, DENNIS NICHOLAS

Defendant Attorney

QUIONES, IVELIS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

08/04/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

MOTION FILED (DAUBERT) REQ THE COURT EXCLUDE TESTIMONY AND OTHER EVID FROM PLNTF'S EXPERT, CHRISTOPHER THOMPSON -FILED BY DEF

08/04/2021:MOTION FILED (DAUBERT) REQ THE COURT EXCLUDE TESTIMONY AND OTHER EVID FROM PLNTF'S EXPERT, CHRISTOPHER THOMPSON -FILED BY DEF

MOTION IN LIMINE REG. BURDEN OF PROOF -FILED BY DEF

08/04/2021:MOTION IN LIMINE REG. BURDEN OF PROOF -FILED BY DEF

MOTION IN LIMINE REG. SPECULATIVE TESTIMONY -FILED BY DEF

08/04/2021:MOTION IN LIMINE REG. SPECULATIVE TESTIMONY -FILED BY DEF

MOTION IN LIMINE -FILED BY DEF (SEE DOCUMENT)

08/04/2021:MOTION IN LIMINE -FILED BY DEF (SEE DOCUMENT)

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE, TESTIMONY, AND EVID REG. CORP REP PERSONAL KNOWLEDGE -FILED BY DEF

08/04/2021:MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE, TESTIMONY, AND EVID REG. CORP REP PERSONAL KNOWLEDGE -FILED BY DEF

MAGISTRATE CIVIL STATUS WORKSHEET

07/26/2021:MAGISTRATE CIVIL STATUS WORKSHEET

NOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING ON 071921 AT 10:30

07/16/2021:NOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING ON 071921 AT 10:30

MEDIATION REPORT - IMPASSE

06/17/2021:MEDIATION REPORT - IMPASSE

ORDER FILED SCHEDULING CAUSE FOR PTC AND JURY TRIAL (SEE ORDER FOR DATES) -DTD 051221

05/13/2021:ORDER FILED SCHEDULING CAUSE FOR PTC AND JURY TRIAL (SEE ORDER FOR DATES) -DTD 051221

COURT WORKSHEET

05/12/2021:COURT WORKSHEET

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTFS

04/28/2021:CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTFS

NOTICE OF FILING DEFS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (ATTACHED)

04/28/2021:NOTICE OF FILING DEFS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (ATTACHED)

CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION ON 061721 AT 10:00 FILED BY DEF

03/17/2021:CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION ON 061721 AT 10:00 FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM 061721 AT 10:00AM

03/12/2021:NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM 061721 AT 10:00AM

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 061721 AT 10:00 VIA ZOOM W/ MEDIATOR FRANK ALLOCCA FILED BY DEF

03/11/2021:NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 061721 AT 10:00 VIA ZOOM W/ MEDIATOR FRANK ALLOCCA FILED BY DEF

STIPULATION FILED (JOINT) OF SELECTION OF MEDIATOR AS FRANK ALLOCCA

03/11/2021:STIPULATION FILED (JOINT) OF SELECTION OF MEDIATOR AS FRANK ALLOCCA

ORDER FILED OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION DTD 030121

03/02/2021:ORDER FILED OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION DTD 030121

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FILED (DAUBERT) REQ THE COURT EXCLUDE TESTIMONY AND OTHER EVID FROM PLNTF'S EXPERT, CHRISTOPHER THOMPSON -FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION IN LIMINE REG. BURDEN OF PROOF -FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION IN LIMINE REG. SPECULATIVE TESTIMONY -FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION IN LIMINE -FILED BY DEF (SEE DOCUMENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE, TESTIMONY, AND EVID REG. CORP REP PERSONAL KNOWLEDGE -FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAGISTRATE CIVIL STATUS WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING ON 071921 AT 10:30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT - IMPASSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM- FIELD ADJUSTER-TBA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - OF TAKING DEPOSTIION DUCES TECUM -ANY AND ALL WITNESSES DESIGNATED AS CORPORATE REP PER RULE 1.310-TBA-TBA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 645633

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001047CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citizens Property Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Quinones, Ivelis