Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/23/2021 at 21:04:34 (UTC).

DETWILER, JAMES, DETWILER, JAMES K Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 DETWILER, JAMES, DETWILER, JAMES K was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

DETWILER, JAMES

Decedent

DETWILER, JAMES K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

BUCK, DAVID ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $9.00 Receipt Number H 730976

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $9.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DTD 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF JAMES K DETWILER (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH JAMES KENNETH DETWILER (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST SIGNED BY DEPUTY CLERK AND E-MAILED TO THE ATTY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY JAMES K. DETWILER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketACCEPTANCE - OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO SEPARATE WRITING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH JAMES KENNETH DETWILER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT JAMES A. DETWILER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION TESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 727973

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000415CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCK, DAVID ALLEN