This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/01/2021 at 13:06:59 (UTC).

DESOUZA, COMPTON Et Al VS SOUTHERN FIDELITY PROPERTY AND

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 DESOUZA, COMPTON filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SOUTHERN FIDELITY PROPERTY AND. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE, ANGELIADIS, GEORGE and VERGARA, PAMELA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

ANGELIADIS, GEORGE

VERGARA, PAMELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DESOUZA, MONICA

DESOUZA, COMPTON

Defendant

SOUTHERN FIDELITY PROPERTY AND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SHEVENELL, KEITH GERALD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

02/26/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CORP REP OF SOUTHERN FIDELITY PROPERTY & CASUALTY INC DBA CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY ON 021121 AT 9:30 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

02/10/2021:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CORP REP OF SOUTHERN FIDELITY PROPERTY & CASUALTY INC DBA CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY ON 021121 AT 9:30 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

ORDER FILED REFERRING CASE TO NON-BINDING ARBITRATION DTD 020421

02/04/2021:ORDER FILED REFERRING CASE TO NON-BINDING ARBITRATION DTD 020421

ORDER FILED OF REFERRALT TO MEDIATION DTD 020421

02/04/2021:ORDER FILED OF REFERRALT TO MEDIATION DTD 020421

ORDER FILED STRIKING CASE FROM TRIAL DOCKET, ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION AND ORDER OF REFERRAL TO NON-BINDING ARBITRATION DTD 020421

02/04/2021:ORDER FILED STRIKING CASE FROM TRIAL DOCKET, ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION AND ORDER OF REFERRAL TO NON-BINDING ARBITRATION DTD 020421

MAGISTRATE CIVIL STATUS WORKSHEET

02/03/2021:MAGISTRATE CIVIL STATUS WORKSHEET

EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE FILED BY PLNTFS

01/22/2021:EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE FILED BY PLNTFS

NOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING ON 012521 AT 2:30

01/22/2021:NOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING ON 012521 AT 2:30

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 012521 AT 2:30 FILED BY DEF

01/19/2021:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 012521 AT 2:30 FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF EXPERT INTERROGS TO PLNTFS FILED BY DEF

01/12/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF EXPERT INTERROGS TO PLNTFS FILED BY DEF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (EXPERT REQUEST) TO PLNTFS FILED BY DEF

01/12/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (EXPERT REQUEST) TO PLNTFS FILED BY DEF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO PLNTFS FILED BY DEF

01/08/2021:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO PLNTFS FILED BY DEF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) TO PLNTFS FILED BY DEF

01/08/2021:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) TO PLNTFS FILED BY DEF

WITNESS LIST (FACT) FILED BY PLNTFS

12/31/2020:WITNESS LIST (FACT) FILED BY PLNTFS

WITNESS LIST - DEFS TRIAL FACT WITNESS LIST

12/29/2020:WITNESS LIST - DEFS TRIAL FACT WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF PAUL MOBERLY ON 032921 AT 12:30 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

11/05/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF PAUL MOBERLY ON 032921 AT 12:30 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF HAROLD GILES ON 032921 AT 9:30 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

11/05/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF HAROLD GILES ON 032921 AT 9:30 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

ORDER FILED SCHEDULING CAUSE FOR PTC ON 080921 AT 11:00 AND JURY TRIAL TO COMMENCE DURING THE ONE WEEK TRIAL TERM BEGINNING 083021 AT 8:30 DTD 100820

10/08/2020:ORDER FILED SCHEDULING CAUSE FOR PTC ON 080921 AT 11:00 AND JURY TRIAL TO COMMENCE DURING THE ONE WEEK TRIAL TERM BEGINNING 083021 AT 8:30 DTD 100820

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CORP REP OF SOUTHERN FIDELITY PROPERTY & CASUALTY INC DBA CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY ON 021121 AT 9:30 VIA ZOOM FILED BY PLNTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED REFERRING CASE TO NON-BINDING ARBITRATION DTD 020421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED OF REFERRALT TO MEDIATION DTD 020421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED STRIKING CASE FROM TRIAL DOCKET, ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION AND ORDER OF REFERRAL TO NON-BINDING ARBITRATION DTD 020421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAGISTRATE CIVIL STATUS WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE FILED BY PLNTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING ON 012521 AT 2:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 012521 AT 2:30 FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 683066

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000445CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEVENELL , KEITH GERALD