This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/29/2022 at 05:44:01 (UTC).

DELANEY, ALICE MARIE VS NSS ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 DELANEY, ALICE MARIE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against NSS ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELANEY, ALICE MARIE

Defendants

NSS ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC

TANGERINE COVE PLC LLC

Not Classified By Court

OF HUGH JOSEPH DELANEY, THE ES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HASKINS, STEPHEN HENRY

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE DATED 021022 FROM KAREN C.D. GABBADON RE PROPOSED AGREED ORDER

02/11/2022:CORRESPONDENCE DATED 021022 FROM KAREN C.D. GABBADON RE PROPOSED AGREED ORDER

ORDER FILED (AGREED) GRANTING DEFS MTN TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MTN TO STAY PROCEEDINGS DTD 021022

02/11/2022:ORDER FILED (AGREED) GRANTING DEFS MTN TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MTN TO STAY PROCEEDINGS DTD 021022

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME TO LUCAS MACYSZYN & DYER LAW FIRM PLLC AND EMAIL DESIG service@lmdlawfirm.com EFFECT 020122 FILED BY PLNTF

02/01/2022:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME TO LUCAS MACYSZYN & DYER LAW FIRM PLLC AND EMAIL DESIG service@lmdlawfirm.com EFFECT 020122 FILED BY PLNTF

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE DATED 021022 FROM KAREN C.D. GABBADON RE PROPOSED AGREED ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED (AGREED) GRANTING DEFS MTN TO DISMISS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MTN TO STAY PROCEEDINGS DTD 021022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME TO LUCAS MACYSZYN & DYER LAW FIRM PLLC AND EMAIL DESIG service@lmdlawfirm.com EFFECT 020122 FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL CORRESPONDENCE FROM REBECA A SAYERS RE CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF ALICE DELANEY ON 122820 AT 9:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF ALICE DELANEY ON 122820 AT 9:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (ARBRITRATION) -FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (ARBRITRATION) -FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number H 750405

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TANGERINE COVE PLC LLC - BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC - BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000646CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less