Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/11/2019 at 01:16:01 (UTC).

DEFRONZO, ANTHONY VS ANY OTHER UNKNOWN TENANT Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 DEFRONZO, ANTHONY filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ANY OTHER UNKNOWN TENANT. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEFRONZO, ANTHONY

Defendants

OLIVERAS, LIZANNETTE R

RUIZ, IVAN R

ANY OTHER UNKNOWN TENANT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING ON FINAL EVICTION - ON 031219 AT 8:30AM, IN CRTROOM C

03/04/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING ON FINAL EVICTION - ON 031219 AT 8:30AM, IN CRTROOM C

delete this entry, please.

02/27/2019:delete this entry, please.

MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT TO IVAN R RUIZ, LIZANNETTE R OLIVERAS AND ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS

02/27/2019:MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT TO IVAN R RUIZ, LIZANNETTE R OLIVERAS AND ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS

RESPONSE FROM PLTF ANTHONY DEFRONZO

02/27/2019:RESPONSE FROM PLTF ANTHONY DEFRONZO

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-IVAN R. RUIZ ON 021519

02/26/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-IVAN R. RUIZ ON 021519

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-SUBSTITUTE SERVED IVAN R. RUIZ FOR ANY OTHER UNKNOWN TENANT NKA JOSE IVAN RODRIQUEZ- STATED THE DEF IS HIS SON-SERVED ON 021519

02/25/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-SUBSTITUTE SERVED IVAN R. RUIZ FOR ANY OTHER UNKNOWN TENANT NKA JOSE IVAN RODRIQUEZ- STATED THE DEF IS HIS SON-SERVED ON 021519

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-SUBSTITUTE SERVED IVAN R. RUIZ FOR LIZANNETTE R. OLIVERAS ON 021519

02/25/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-SUBSTITUTE SERVED IVAN R. RUIZ FOR LIZANNETTE R. OLIVERAS ON 021519

ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT IVAN R RUIZ

02/22/2019:ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT IVAN R RUIZ

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/15/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR LIZANETTE R OLIVERAS

02/15/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR LIZANETTE R OLIVERAS

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR IVAN R RUIZ

02/15/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR IVAN R RUIZ

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

02/15/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

PETITION FOR EVICTION WITH LEASE & 3 DAY NOTICE

02/15/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION WITH LEASE & 3 DAY NOTICE

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR ANY OTHER UNKNOWN TENANT

02/15/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR ANY OTHER UNKNOWN TENANT

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR LIZANNETTE R OLIVERAS

02/15/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR LIZANNETTE R OLIVERAS

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR IVAN R RUIZ

02/15/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR IVAN R RUIZ

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON FINAL EVICTION - ON 031219 AT 8:30AM, IN CRTROOM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Payment received: $775.75 Receipt Number H 613975

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Assessment 3 Total Assessed $775.75 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $775.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • delete this entry, please.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT TO IVAN R RUIZ, LIZANNETTE R OLIVERAS AND ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE FROM PLTF ANTHONY DEFRONZO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-IVAN R. RUIZ ON 021519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-SUBSTITUTE SERVED IVAN R. RUIZ FOR ANY OTHER UNKNOWN TENANT NKA JOSE IVAN RODRIQUEZ- STATED THE DEF IS HIS SON-SERVED ON 021519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED-SUBSTITUTE SERVED IVAN R. RUIZ FOR LIZANNETTE R. OLIVERAS ON 021519

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR ANY OTHER UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR LIZANNETTE R OLIVERAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR IVAN R RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Payment received: $236.00 Receipt Number H 611050

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $236.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $236.00 Balance Remaining $236.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Case 272019CC000222CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less