This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 11/02/2021 at 14:41:22 (UTC).

DEBORAH, FIELDS KLOPP, FIELDS, BARBARA ANN Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 DEBORAH, FIELDS KLOPP, FIELDS, BARBARA ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEBORAH, FIELDS KLOPP

Decedent

FIELDS, BARBARA ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FELICE, CARRIE NICOLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DTD 080321

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH BARBARA ANN FIELDS (ORIGINAL) OR BOOK 4031 PG 1602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDISCLAIMER OF INTEREST VAUGHN FIELDS JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH BARBARA ANN FIELDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number H 747854

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000966CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELICE, CARRIE NICOLE