Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 18:15:55 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC VS BURNS, NIKI

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BURNS, NIKI. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

BURNS, NIKI

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

03/14/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,611.10

03/14/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,611.10

SUMMONS ISSUED NIKI BURNS (BLANK)

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED NIKI BURNS (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NIKI BURNS - PTC 050119 AT 10:15 CRTRM C

03/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NIKI BURNS - PTC 050119 AT 10:15 CRTRM C

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NIKI BURNS - PTC 050119 AT 10:15 CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 617010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED NIKI BURNS (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1,611.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 272019SC000662SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less