This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/01/2021 at 10:52:17 (UTC).

CRESPO, ROSA VS JANS, DENNIS

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 CRESPO, ROSA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JANS, DENNIS. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANGELIADIS, GEORGE GREGORY, SCAGLIONE, DONALD E and ANGELIADIS, GEORGE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANGELIADIS, GEORGE GREGORY

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

ANGELIADIS, GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRESPO, ROSA

Defendant

JANS, DENNIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRERA, AMY MARIE

Defendant Attorney

GREEN, M. SUZANNE CHISTOLINI

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON PLNTF, CARMEN MARRERO ON 081120 FILED BY DEF

08/11/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON PLNTF, CARMEN MARRERO ON 081120 FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF - OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PL (CARMEN MARRERO) VIA ZOOM ON OCT 6, 2020 @10:00

08/19/2020:NOTICE OF - OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PL (CARMEN MARRERO) VIA ZOOM ON OCT 6, 2020 @10:00

NOTICE OF - ACCEPTANCE OF PLNTF ROSA CRESPO'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED ON 070720 FILED BY DEF

08/06/2020:NOTICE OF - ACCEPTANCE OF PLNTF ROSA CRESPO'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED ON 070720 FILED BY DEF

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO RC: WINDHAVEN INSURANCE FILED BY DEF

08/03/2020:CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO RC: WINDHAVEN INSURANCE FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

07/10/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (AMENDED - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

06/05/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (AMENDED - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

ORDER FILED ON DEFS MTNS TO CONSOLIDATE IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART - THE CASES SHALL BE CONSOLIDATED FOR THE PURPOSE OF DISCOVERY AND DEPOS, NOT TRIAL AND ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURE DTD 060420

06/04/2020:ORDER FILED ON DEFS MTNS TO CONSOLIDATE IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART - THE CASES SHALL BE CONSOLIDATED FOR THE PURPOSE OF DISCOVERY AND DEPOS, NOT TRIAL AND ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURE DTD 060420

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

06/03/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

06/02/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY PLNTF

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLNTF

06/02/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLNTF

ORDER FILED TO RESPOND TO DEF DENNIS JANS' MTN TO CONSOLIDATE - PLNTF SHALL RESPOND W/I 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER AND ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURE DTD 051520

05/15/2020:ORDER FILED TO RESPOND TO DEF DENNIS JANS' MTN TO CONSOLIDATE - PLNTF SHALL RESPOND W/I 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER AND ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURE DTD 051520

OPPOSITION TO - DEFS MTN TO CONSOLIDATE FILED BY PLNTF

05/14/2020:OPPOSITION TO - DEFS MTN TO CONSOLIDATE FILED BY PLNTF

DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEF, DENNIS JANS FILED BY PLNTF

05/13/2020:DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEF, DENNIS JANS FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

05/07/2020:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

05/07/2020:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER REGARDING COURT CLOSURE DUE TO COVID-19 PANDEMIC

03/18/2020:ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER REGARDING COURT CLOSURE DUE TO COVID-19 PANDEMIC

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DENNIS JANS

03/16/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DENNIS JANS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/13/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PL (CARMEN MARRERO) VIA ZOOM ON OCT 6, 2020 @10:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON PLNTF, CARMEN MARRERO ON 081120 FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - ACCEPTANCE OF PLNTF ROSA CRESPO'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED ON 070720 FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO RC: WINDHAVEN INSURANCE FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION (CARMEN MARRERO) FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (FIRST) TO PLNTF, CARMEN MARRERO FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (FIRST) TO PLNTF ROSA CRESPO FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $412.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DENNIS JANS (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $412.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000276CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less