Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/26/2021 at 19:32:41 (UTC).

COX, SARINAH VS HENTZ, CHRISTIAN

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 COX, SARINAH filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HENTZ, CHRISTIAN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COX, SARINAH

Respondent

HENTZ, CHRISTIAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD PEGGY BRYANT 3/5/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketORDER FILED DISMISSING CASE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR CIVIL INDIGENCY - INDIGENT PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FILED TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMOTION FILED TO DEVIATE FROM CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCHILD SUPP GUIDELINE WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER W/CHILDREN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER - SARINAH COX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHRISTIAN HENTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000377DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less