This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/07/2021 at 21:06:56 (UTC).

COON, DAVID RAY, VICKERS, DORA ANN Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 COON, DAVID RAY, VICKERS, DORA ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Decedent

VICKERS, DORA ANN

Not Classified By Court

COON, DAVID RAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

BROWN, JAMES MARTIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAMENDED PET FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketReopened for Civil Other on 10/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT TO ADMISSION OF WILL TO PROBATE BRENDA MATTHEWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT TO ADMISSION OF WILL TO PROBATE GAIL MCCALLISTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT GERALDINE MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT TO ADMISSION OF WILL TO PROBATE GERALDINE MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketORDER FILED DENYING PETITION TO ADMIT FOREIGN WILL AND ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION DTTD 09.16.2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION TESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH DORA ANN VICKERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF DEATH FOR DORA ANN VICKERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketPET TO ADMIT FOREIGN WILL TO RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT DAVID RAY COON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 754400

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP001166CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, JAMES MARTIN