Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 06/17/2019 at 13:15:46 (UTC).

COOK, SUSAN J VS WALTON, LORRAINE A

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 COOK, SUSAN J filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against WALTON, LORRAINE A. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOK, SUSAN J

Defendant

WALTON, LORRAINE A

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

06/10/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY FOR LORRAINE A WALTON

06/07/2019:ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY FOR LORRAINE A WALTON

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK FOR LORRAINE A WALTON

06/06/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK FOR LORRAINE A WALTON

MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT FILED BY SUSAN J COOK

06/06/2019:MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT FILED BY SUSAN J COOK

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON LORRAINE A WALTON (POSTED RESIDENTIAL) AT 052919

05/31/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON LORRAINE A WALTON (POSTED RESIDENTIAL) AT 052919

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/24/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

05/24/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT

05/24/2019:PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT

PETITION FOR EVICTION WITH 3 DAY NOTICE

05/24/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION WITH 3 DAY NOTICE

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR LOORRAINE A WALTON (PL)

05/24/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR LOORRAINE A WALTON (PL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Payment received: $7.00 Receipt Number H 630270

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY FOR LORRAINE A WALTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK FOR LORRAINE A WALTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT FILED BY SUSAN J COOK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON LORRAINE A WALTON (POSTED RESIDENTIAL) AT 052919

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION WITH 3 DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR LOORRAINE A WALTON (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Payment received: $202.00 Receipt Number H 627763

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $202.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Case 272019CC000685CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less