This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/03/2019 at 16:16:27 (UTC).

COLON FIGUEROA, ISMAEL VS HITSON, WILLIAM Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 COLON FIGUEROA, ISMAEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HITSON, WILLIAM. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLON FIGUEROA, ISMAEL

Defendants

HITSON, WILLIAM

PRO TEAM PLUMBING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GOAN, KEITH MICHAEL

METZGER, JOSEPH THOMAS TUCKER

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS service@metzgerlaw.net FILED BY DEF, WILLIAM HITSON

10/23/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS service@metzgerlaw.net FILED BY DEF, WILLIAM HITSON

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOSEPH T METZGER ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF

10/23/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOSEPH T METZGER ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF, WILLIAM HITSON

10/16/2019:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF, WILLIAM HITSON

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: WILLIAM HITSON

10/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: WILLIAM HITSON

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PRO TEAM PLUBMING LLC

10/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PRO TEAM PLUBMING LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAM HITSON ~ BLANK

10/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAM HITSON ~ BLANK

NOTICE OF SERVICE INTERROGATORIES

10/11/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE

10/11/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/11/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/11/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/11/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/11/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

10/11/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PRO TEAM PLUMBING LLC ~ BLANK

10/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO PRO TEAM PLUMBING LLC ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED BLANK

10/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED BLANK

COVER SHEET

10/11/2019:COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS service@metzgerlaw.net FILED BY DEF, WILLIAM HITSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOSEPH T METZGER ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF, WILLIAM HITSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: WILLIAM HITSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PRO TEAM PLUBMING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number H 650649

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAM HITSON ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PRO TEAM PLUMBING LLC ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Case 272019CA001153CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer METZGER , JOSEPH THOMAS TUCKER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOAN , KEITH MICHAEL