Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/30/2021 at 21:09:05 (UTC).

COGHLAN, ANGELIKA P, DEMOS, HELGA P Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 COGHLAN, ANGELIKA P, DEMOS, HELGA P was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COGHLAN, ANGELIKA P

Decedent

DEMOS, HELGA P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

HENGESBACH, SEAN EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCOPY REQUEST COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $4.50 Receipt Number H 726694

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $4.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $4.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY DTD 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE DTD 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DTD 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF HELGA DEMOS ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH OF HELGA DEMOS ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketFUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH HELGA DEMOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketWAIVER AND CONSENT GUDRUN ZUNKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketWAIVER AND CONSENT ANGELIKA P. COGHLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION TESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number H 723395

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000288CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENGESBACH, SEAN EDWARD