This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 18:19:12 (UTC).

COASTAL CLEANING SYSTEMS, LLC VS CHANDLER, JAMES

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 COASTAL CLEANING SYSTEMS, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHANDLER, JAMES. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIE HEALIS and HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KRISTIE HEALIS

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COASTAL CLEANING SYSTEMS, LLC

Defendant

CHANDLER, JAMES

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT FILED - FOR THE HCSO SERVICE FEE (FILED BY PLNTF)

09/25/2020:RECEIPT FILED - FOR THE HCSO SERVICE FEE (FILED BY PLNTF)

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED - JAMES CHANDLER, SUBSTITUTE SERVED TO JENNIFER FAGAN CO-RESIDENT - 092220

09/23/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED - JAMES CHANDLER, SUBSTITUTE SERVED TO JENNIFER FAGAN CO-RESIDENT - 092220

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

09/21/2020:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

DOCUMENTS FILED - SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

09/21/2020:DOCUMENTS FILED - SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2457.93

09/21/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2457.93

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JAMES CHANDLER, PTC 120120 @ 10:45AM, CRTRM C (PL)

09/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JAMES CHANDLER, PTC 120120 @ 10:45AM, CRTRM C (PL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/01/2020 10:45; Judge: HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE; Docket Type: AMPT; Location: HERNANDO COUNTY COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FILED - FOR THE HCSO SERVICE FEE (FILED BY PLNTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED - JAMES CHANDLER, SUBSTITUTE SERVED TO JENNIFER FAGAN CO-RESIDENT - 092220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENTS FILED - SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $2457.93

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JAMES CHANDLER, PTC 120120 @ 10:45AM, CRTRM C (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $192.00 Receipt Number H 699615

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $192.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $192.00 Balance Remaining $192.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketEvent AMPT scheduled on 12/1/2020 at 1045 AM, MX - Judge KRISTIE HEALIS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020SC001913SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less