This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 07/06/2019 16:15:17

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by CLINARD, THOMAS against MEYER, CALEB ERIC in the jurisdiction of Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXMX
  • Filing Date 06/13/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
  • Jurisdiction Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County
  • Judge ANGELIADIS, GEORGE
  • Courthouse Hernando County Courthouse
  • County Hernando
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Plaintiff CLINARD, THOMAS
  • Represented By
    • KEMP, STACY A
  • Defendant MEYER, ROSALIE M
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant MEYER, CALEB ERIC
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Not Yet Classified MYER, CALEB
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROSALIE M MEYER ~BLANK

06/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROSALIE M MEYER ~BLANK

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS ISSUED TO CALEB ERIC MEYER~ BLANK

06/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO CALEB ERIC MEYER~ BLANK

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ROSALIE M MEYER

06/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ROSALIE M MEYER

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CALEB ERIC MEYER

06/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CALEB ERIC MEYER

Free with Subscription
REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF, THOMAS CLINARD'S FIRST SET OF ...

06/13/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF, THOMAS CLINARD'S FI...

Free with Subscription
REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF, THOMAS CLINARD'S FIRST SET OF ...

06/13/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF, THOMAS CLINARD'S FI...

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ROSALIE M MEYER
  • 06/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CALEB ERIC MEYER
  • 06/14/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number H 631182
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned
  • 06/13/2019
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF, THOMAS CLINARD'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, CALEB ERIC MEYER
  • 06/13/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROSALIE M MEYER ~BLANK
  • 06/13/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CALEB ERIC MEYER~ BLANK
  • 06/13/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF, THOMAS CLINARD'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, ROSALIE M MEYER
  • 06/13/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF, THOMAS CLINARD'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT, CALEB ERIC MEYER
  • 06/13/2019
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF, THOMAS CLINARD'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, ROSALIE M MEYER
  • 06/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF, THOMAS CLINARD'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ROSALIE M MEYER
  • 06/13/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF, THOMAS CLINARD'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, CALEB ERIC MEYER
  • 06/13/2019
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED
  • 06/13/2019
  • COVER SHEET
  • 06/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00
  • 06/13/2019
  • Case 272019CA000694CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/13/2019

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.