Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 21:20:34 (UTC).

CLEMENT, GEORGE C, FELLOWS, LISA L Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 CLEMENT, GEORGE C, FELLOWS, LISA L was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Decedent

CLEMENT, GEORGE C

Not Classified By Court

FELLOWS, LISA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

BOMHOFF, PHILIP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketAMENDED PET FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF - OF ZOOM HEARING ON THE PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ON 05/07/2021 AT 8:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF GEORGE C. CLEMENT ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH OF GEORGE CLEMENT ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 728950

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH GEORGE CLEMENT (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY GEORGE C CLEMENT (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DOMICILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000449CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOMHOFF, PHILIP