This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/05/2019 at 12:58:46 (UTC).

CLARK, WILLIAM A. VS FRAZIER, WILANA

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 CLARK, WILLIAM A filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against FRAZIER, WILANA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLARK, WILLIAM A.

Defendant

FRAZIER, WILANA

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED WILANA FRAZIER ON 1/23/19 AT 7:15AM - PLACED WILLIAM CLARK IN POSSESSION OF PREMISE

01/30/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED WILANA FRAZIER ON 1/23/19 AT 7:15AM - PLACED WILLIAM CLARK IN POSSESSION OF PREMISE

WRIT OF POSSESSION FOR WILANA FRAZIER (PL)

01/22/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION FOR WILANA FRAZIER (PL)

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST DEFENDANT WILANA FRAZIER

01/18/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST DEFENDANT WILANA FRAZIER

ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVICTION DTD 011819

01/18/2019:ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVICTION DTD 011819

MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT AGAINST WILANA FRAZIER

01/18/2019:MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT AGAINST WILANA FRAZIER

ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT ENTERED ON 011719 AGAINST WILANA FRAZIER DTD 011819

01/18/2019:ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT ENTERED ON 011719 AGAINST WILANA FRAZIER DTD 011819

RESPONSE TO EVICTION FILED BY WILANA FRAZIER

01/17/2019:RESPONSE TO EVICTION FILED BY WILANA FRAZIER

CLERK DEFAULT FOR WILANA FRAZIER

01/17/2019:CLERK DEFAULT FOR WILANA FRAZIER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR WILANA FRAZIER

01/17/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR WILANA FRAZIER

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON WILANA FRAZIER (SUBST. SERV., BY SERVING WILLIE BATES, CO-RESIDENT) AT 011019

01/14/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON WILANA FRAZIER (SUBST. SERV., BY SERVING WILLIE BATES, CO-RESIDENT) AT 011019

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO DEFENDANT, WILANA FRAZIER

01/10/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO DEFENDANT, WILANA FRAZIER

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT TO WILANA FRAZIER

01/09/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT TO WILANA FRAZIER

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

01/09/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE AGREEMENT

01/09/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE AGREEMENT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: WILANA FRAZIER (PL)

01/09/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: WILANA FRAZIER (PL)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED WILANA FRAZIER ON 1/23/19 AT 7:15AM - PLACED WILLIAM CLARK IN POSSESSION OF PREMISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION FOR WILANA FRAZIER (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Payment received: $7.00 Receipt Number H 606693

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST DEFENDANT WILANA FRAZIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY - EVICTION DTD 011819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT AGAINST WILANA FRAZIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT ENTERED ON 011719 AGAINST WILANA FRAZIER DTD 011819

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE AND LEASE AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Payment received: $202.00 Receipt Number H 604757

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: WILANA FRAZIER (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $202.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Case 272019CC000051CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less