This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/13/2021 at 23:45:41 (UTC).

CITIZENS BANK NA VS SANGVIC, ERIC E Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 CITIZENS BANK NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SANGVIC, ERIC E. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIZENS BANK NA

Defendants

SANGVIC, THERESA CHRISTINA

SANGVIC, ERIC E

Not Classified By Court

SANGVIC, THERESA C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCADIS, RALPH SAM

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

09/12/2019:COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ERIC E SANGVIC~ BLANK

09/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ERIC E SANGVIC~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO THERESA CHRISTINA SANGVIC ~ BLANK

09/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO THERESA CHRISTINA SANGVIC ~ BLANK

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

09/12/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

09/12/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THERESA CHRISTINA SANGVIC

09/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THERESA CHRISTINA SANGVIC

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ERIC E SANGVIC

09/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ERIC E SANGVIC

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON THERESA CHRISTINA SANGVIC AKA THERESA C SANGVIC 092119

09/23/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON THERESA CHRISTINA SANGVIC AKA THERESA C SANGVIC 092119

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON ERIC E SANGVIC (SUBST SERVED TO TYLER SANGVIC) 092119

09/23/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON ERIC E SANGVIC (SUBST SERVED TO TYLER SANGVIC) 092119

ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT ERIC E. SANGVIC

10/02/2019:ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT ERIC E. SANGVIC

STIPULATION FILED TO STAY ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEF AGREES TO PAY PRINC $47,434.61, INT $1697.74 AND COSTS $36.26 IN THE TOTAL SUM OF $49,168.61 TO BE PD: $150.00 PER MO DUE ON OR BEFORE 121519 AND CONT ON OR BEFORE THE 15TH OF EA AND EVERY MO UNTIL PD

12/24/2019:STIPULATION FILED TO STAY ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEF AGREES TO PAY PRINC $47,434.61, INT $1697.74 AND COSTS $36.26 IN THE TOTAL SUM OF $49,168.61 TO BE PD: $150.00 PER MO DUE ON OR BEFORE 121519 AND CONT ON OR BEFORE THE 15TH OF EA AND EVERY MO UNTIL PD IN FULL

ORDER FILED TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE FILE DTD 012320

01/27/2020:ORDER FILED TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE FILE DTD 012320

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE FILE DTD 012320

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FILED TO STAY ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEF AGREES TO PAY PRINC $47,434.61, INT $1697.74 AND COSTS $36.26 IN THE TOTAL SUM OF $49,168.61 TO BE PD: $150.00 PER MO DUE ON OR BEFORE 121519 AND CONT ON OR BEFORE THE 15TH OF EA AND EVERY MO UNTIL PD IN FULL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT ERIC E. SANGVIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON ERIC E SANGVIC (SUBST SERVED TO TYLER SANGVIC) 092119

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON THERESA CHRISTINA SANGVIC AKA THERESA C SANGVIC 092119

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ERIC E SANGVIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THERESA CHRISTINA SANGVIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number H 645778

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO THERESA CHRISTINA SANGVIC ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ERIC E SANGVIC~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001057CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITIZENS BANK N A is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcadis, Ralph S