This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 05/30/2019 at 18:17:45 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS MENDEZPAGAN, NELSON R

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 CITIBANK, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MENDEZPAGAN, NELSON R. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

MENDEZPAGAN, NELSON R

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NELSON R MENDEZPAGAN - PTC 071719 AT 11:30 CRTRM B

05/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NELSON R MENDEZPAGAN - PTC 071719 AT 11:30 CRTRM B

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NELSON R MENDEZPAGAN (BLANK)

05/09/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NELSON R MENDEZPAGAN (BLANK)

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

05/06/2019:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILING

05/06/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILING

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,989.15

05/06/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,989.15

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NELSON R MENDEZPAGAN - PTC 071719 AT 11:30 CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number H 626019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NELSON R MENDEZPAGAN (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 625011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,989.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Case 272019SC001088SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less