Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 18:36:08 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS MALKIN, JOHN

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 CITIBANK N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MALKIN, JOHN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

MALKIN, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINEN, DREW RICHARD

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOHN MALKIN - PTC 060321 AT 11:30 CRTRM C

04/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOHN MALKIN - PTC 060321 AT 11:30 CRTRM C

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

03/31/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $3530.25

03/31/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $3530.25

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO JOHN MALKIN (BLANK)

03/31/2021:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO JOHN MALKIN (BLANK)

NOTICE OF - DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

03/31/2021:NOTICE OF - DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY BY PLNTF

03/31/2021:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY BY PLNTF

COVER SHEET

03/31/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOHN MALKIN - PTC 060321 AT 11:30 CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 729081

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO JOHN MALKIN (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $3530.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC000730SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINEN, DREW RICHARD