This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 11/01/2021 at 17:04:39 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS LONG, SHERILEE

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 CITIBANK N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LONG, SHERILEE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

LONG, SHERILEE

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

07/13/2021:COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM 2772.50

07/13/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM 2772.50

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

07/13/2021:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

07/13/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

NOTICE OF -

07/13/2021:NOTICE OF -

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO SHERILEE LONG ~ BLANK

07/13/2021:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO SHERILEE LONG ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHERILEE LONG - PTC 092221 AT 11:45 CRTRM C

07/21/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHERILEE LONG - PTC 092221 AT 11:45 CRTRM C

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON SHERILEE LONG 091721

09/21/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON SHERILEE LONG 091721

COURT WORKSHEET - DEF TO PAY $50 A MONTH ON 15TH OF EVERY MONTH STARTING 10/15/21

09/22/2021:COURT WORKSHEET - DEF TO PAY $50 A MONTH ON 15TH OF EVERY MONTH STARTING 10/15/21

STIPULATION FILED FOR SETTLEMENT DEF SHALL REPAY $2000.00 AT $50.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 101521

10/05/2021:STIPULATION FILED FOR SETTLEMENT DEF SHALL REPAY $2000.00 AT $50.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 101521

ORDER FILED ACCEPTING STIP AND DISMISSING CASE DTD 101221

10/12/2021:ORDER FILED ACCEPTING STIP AND DISMISSING CASE DTD 101221

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

10/25/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED ACCEPTING STIP AND DISMISSING CASE DTD 101221

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FILED FOR SETTLEMENT DEF SHALL REPAY $2000.00 AT $50.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 101521

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - DEF TO PAY $50 A MONTH ON 15TH OF EVERY MONTH STARTING 10/15/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON SHERILEE LONG 091721

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SHERILEE LONG - PTC 092221 AT 11:45 CRTRM C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 746453

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO SHERILEE LONG ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM 2772.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC001824SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant