Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 18:35:22 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. VS JACOBS, MIRIAM

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 CITIBANK, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JACOBS, MIRIAM. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

JACOBS, MIRIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURKETT, BRETT HAROLD

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MIRIAM JACOBS - PTC ON 060221 AT 11:15AM CRTRM C

04/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MIRIAM JACOBS - PTC ON 060221 AT 11:15AM CRTRM C

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

03/31/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $3168.29

03/31/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $3168.29

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MIRIAM JACOBS (BLANK)

03/31/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MIRIAM JACOBS (BLANK)

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY - BY PLNTF

03/31/2021:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY - BY PLNTF

COVER SHEET

03/31/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MIRIAM JACOBS - PTC ON 060221 AT 11:15AM CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 729522

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MIRIAM JACOBS (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY - BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $3168.29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC000744SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURKETT BRETT H