This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 12/20/2019 at 13:16:08 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. VS HUMPHREYS, JANE ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 CITIBANK N A filed an Other lawsuit against HUMPHREYS, JANE ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

HUMPHREYS, JANE ELIZABETH

Brooksville, FL 34601-8606

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

02/18/2020:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON JANE HUMPHREYS

01/23/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON JANE HUMPHREYS

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JANE HUMPHREYS

11/27/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JANE HUMPHREYS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JANE HUMPHREYS ~ BLANK

11/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JANE HUMPHREYS ~ BLANK

NOTICE OF - OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY FLYNN LAVRAR ESQ

11/26/2019:NOTICE OF - OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY FLYNN LAVRAR ESQ

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

11/26/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

11/26/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

COVER SHEET

11/26/2019:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JANE HUMPHREYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 657625

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JANE HUMPHREYS ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY FLYNN LAVRAR ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CC001588CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant