This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/01/2021 at 08:32:40 (UTC).

CIESLIKOWSKI, LORI A VS D R HORTON INC

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 CIESLIKOWSKI, LORI A filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against D R HORTON INC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE, ANGELIADIS, GEORGE and VERGARA, PAMELA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

ANGELIADIS, GEORGE

VERGARA, PAMELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIESLIKOWSKI, LORI A

Defendant

D R HORTON INC

Not Classified By Court

Z-WRAP OF FLORIDA LLC

NULOOK STUCCO AND DESIGN LLC

PROBUILD COMPANY LLC

A & D PLUS CONSTRUCTION SERVIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'BRIEN, NEIL PATRICK

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

KAPSALES, PETER J

SWITZER, MICHAEL WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - HIGH PRIORITY (NTC OF COMPLETION OF SERV OF PROCESS AND CASE STATUS REPORT)

06/23/2021:NOTICE - HIGH PRIORITY (NTC OF COMPLETION OF SERV OF PROCESS AND CASE STATUS REPORT)

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FILED BY PROBUILD COMPANY LLC

09/10/2020:ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FILED BY PROBUILD COMPANY LLC

CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION ON 082520 FILED BY THIRD-PARTY DEF, Z-WRAP OF FLORIDA LLC

08/24/2020:CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION ON 082520 FILED BY THIRD-PARTY DEF, Z-WRAP OF FLORIDA LLC

CERTIFICATE RE MEDIATION ON 082520 AT 9:30 FILED BY DEF, A&D PLUS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC

08/24/2020:CERTIFICATE RE MEDIATION ON 082520 AT 9:30 FILED BY DEF, A&D PLUS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC

ORDER FILED ON THIRD-PART DEFS MTN TO DISMISS AND TO QUASH THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT BY A&D PLUS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC BASED ON LACK OF OR IMPROPER SERVICE OF SUMMONS IS DENIED AS MOOT AND ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURE DTD 081320

08/13/2020:ORDER FILED ON THIRD-PART DEFS MTN TO DISMISS AND TO QUASH THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT BY A&D PLUS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC BASED ON LACK OF OR IMPROPER SERVICE OF SUMMONS IS DENIED AS MOOT AND ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURE DTD 081320

RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO THIRD- PARTY DEF, Z-WRAP OF FLORIDA LLC'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY DEF/THIRD-PARTY PLNTF, D.R. HORTON INC

08/10/2020:RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO THIRD- PARTY DEF, Z-WRAP OF FLORIDA LLC'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY DEF/THIRD-PARTY PLNTF, D.R. HORTON INC

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON DEF, D.R. HORTON INC ON 072220 FILED BY PLNTF

07/22/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON DEF, D.R. HORTON INC ON 072220 FILED BY PLNTF

REPLY or ANSWER TO THIRD-PARTY DEF, Z-WRAP OF FLORIDA LLC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRM DEFENSES TO D.R. HORTON INC'S THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT FILED BY DEF/THIRD-PARTY PLNTF, D.R. HORTON INC

07/10/2020:REPLY or ANSWER TO THIRD-PARTY DEF, Z-WRAP OF FLORIDA LLC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRM DEFENSES TO D.R. HORTON INC'S THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT FILED BY DEF/THIRD-PARTY PLNTF, D.R. HORTON INC

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 082520 AT 9:30 W/ MEDIATOR DEVON COUGHLAN ESQ FILED BY PLNTF

07/09/2020:NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 082520 AT 9:30 W/ MEDIATOR DEVON COUGHLAN ESQ FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE FROM THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT Z-WRAP OF FLORIDAS LLC'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PL, LORI A CIESLIKOWSKI

07/07/2020:NOTICE OF SERVICE FROM THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT Z-WRAP OF FLORIDAS LLC'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PL, LORI A CIESLIKOWSKI

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: Z-WRAP OF FLORIDA LLC (BLANK)

04/03/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: Z-WRAP OF FLORIDA LLC (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NULOOK STUCCO AND DESIGN LLC (BLANK)

04/03/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NULOOK STUCCO AND DESIGN LLC (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: A & D PLUS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC (BLANK)

04/03/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: A & D PLUS CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC (BLANK)

RETURN OF SERVICE - D.R. HORTON, INC, WAS SERVED ON 02/06/2020

02/07/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE - D.R. HORTON, INC, WAS SERVED ON 02/06/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: D.R. HORTON, INC. C/O C T CORPORATION SYSTEM, AS REGISTERED AGENT FOR D.R. HORTON, INC.

01/28/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: D.R. HORTON, INC. C/O C T CORPORATION SYSTEM, AS REGISTERED AGENT FOR D.R. HORTON, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED D.R. HORTON, INC. C/O C T CORPORTAION SYSTEM, A REG AGENT FOR D.R. HORTON, INC. (BLANK)

01/24/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED D.R. HORTON, INC. C/O C T CORPORTAION SYSTEM, A REG AGENT FOR D.R. HORTON, INC. (BLANK)

COMPLAINT FILED

01/24/2020:COMPLAINT FILED

COVER SHEET

01/24/2020:COVER SHEET

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLNTF, LORI A. CIESLIKOWSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - HIGH PRIORITY (NTC OF COMPLETION OF SERV OF PROCESS AND CASE STATUS REPORT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM TO MICHAEL J. RIGELSKY, ESQUIRE OF GOLDBERG SEGALLA, LLP FOR DEF, BUILDERS FIRSTSOURCE-FLORIDA, LLC AND DESIG OF EMAIL ORLpleadings@goldbergsegall.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ian.gillan@knchlaw.com (SECOND AMENDED) FILED BY DEF/THIRD-PARTY PLNTF, D.R. HORTON INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketADM ORD-REASSIGN JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketJudge: VERGARA , PAMELA Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF THIRD-PARTY DEF, PROBUILD COMPANY LLC FILED BY DEF/THIRD-PARTY PLNTF, D.R. HORTON INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEF, PROBUILD COMPANY LLC TO D.R. HORTON INC'S THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT FILE DBY DEF/THIRD-PARTY PLNTF, D.R. HORTON INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FILED BY PROBUILD COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS CNservice@florinroebig.com FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: D.R. HORTON, INC. C/O C T CORPORATION SYSTEM, AS REGISTERED AGENT FOR D.R. HORTON, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 666576

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED D.R. HORTON, INC. C/O C T CORPORTAION SYSTEM, A REG AGENT FOR D.R. HORTON, INC. (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000078CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Z WRAP OF FLORIDA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NULOOK STUCCO AND DESIGN, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROBUILD COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where D R HORTON INC is a litigant