This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 07/06/2019 16:16:14

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by CHOWDREY, SCOTT against BENSON AND SONS ENTERPRISES IN in the jurisdiction of Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXMX
  • Filing Date 06/13/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
  • Jurisdiction Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County
  • Judge SCAGLIONE, DONALD E
  • Courthouse Hernando County Courthouse
  • County Hernando
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Plaintiff CHOWDREY, SCOTT
  • Represented By
    • VENTO, CHRISTIANA ANTOINETTE
  • Defendant MCNALLY, KENNETH
  • Represented By
    • HERMIDA, ROLAND A
  • Defendant BENSON AND SONS ENTERPRISES IN
  • Represented By
    • HERMIDA, ROLAND A
  • Plaintiff COWDREY, SCOTT
  • Represented By
    • VENTO, CHRISTIANA ANTOINETTE

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KENNETH MCNALLY

06/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KENNETH MCNALLY

Free with Subscription
SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BENSON & SONS ENTERPRISES, INC

06/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BENSON & SONS ENTERPRISES, IN...

Free with Subscription
REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/13/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

Free with Subscription
REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/13/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

Free with Subscription
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, BENSON ...

06/25/2019:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO PLNTF FILED BY D...

Free with Subscription
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/13/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, BENSON & SONS ENTERPRISES INC
  • 06/25/2019
  • NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (INITIAL) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, BENSON & SONS ENTERPRISES INC
  • 06/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OFROLAND A HERMIDA II ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEFS
  • 06/25/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS Service-rhermida@bankerlopez.com FILED BY DEFS, KENNETH MCNALLY AND BENSON & SONS ENTERPRISES INC
  • 06/25/2019
  • ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY BENSON & SONS ENTERPRISES INC
  • 06/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: KENNETH MCNALLY
  • 06/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: BENSON & SONS ENTERPRISES, INC
  • 06/14/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number H 631187
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned
  • 06/13/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
  • 06/13/2019
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE
  • 06/13/2019
  • INTERROGATORY
  • 06/13/2019
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
  • 06/13/2019
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE
  • 06/13/2019
  • INTERROGATORY NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
  • 06/13/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE
  • 06/13/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO BENSON & SONS ENTERPRISES, INC ~ BLANK
  • 06/13/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO KENNETH MCNALLY ~ BLANK
  • 06/13/2019
  • COVER SHEET

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.