This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/02/2021 at 02:58:20 (UTC).

CHIAPPERINO, FRANK ANTHONY VS AAMODT, ANDREW ALDEN Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 CHIAPPERINO, FRANK ANTHONY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AAMODT, ANDREW ALDEN. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHIAPPERINO, FRANK ANTHONY

Defendants

AAMODT, ANDREW ALDEN

NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACYSZYN, MARTIN

Defendant Attorney

MACKINNON, ROBERT GAVIN

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -FILED BY DEF, NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION, INC.

10/15/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -FILED BY DEF, NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION, INC.

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (AMENDED) FILED BY NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC AND ANDREW ALDEN AAMODT

09/27/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (AMENDED) FILED BY NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC AND ANDREW ALDEN AAMODT

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEF NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC

09/23/2021:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEF NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF R GAVIN MACKINNON ESQ, JEREMY M BROWN ESQ OF THE LAW FIRM GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP AS COUNSEL FOR DEFS AND EMAIL DESIG orlpleadings@goldbergsegalla.com

08/26/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF R GAVIN MACKINNON ESQ, JEREMY M BROWN ESQ OF THE LAW FIRM GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP AS COUNSEL FOR DEFS AND EMAIL DESIG orlpleadings@goldbergsegalla.com

NOTICE OF SERVICE AND RESPONSE TO DEF, NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION, INC. REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/25/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE AND RESPONSE TO DEF, NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION, INC. REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE AND RESPONSE TO DEF'S NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION, INC. FIRST SET OF INTERROGS

08/25/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE AND RESPONSE TO DEF'S NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION, INC. FIRST SET OF INTERROGS

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OR COMPLIANCE ON 071221

08/02/2021:NOTICE OF COMPLETION OR COMPLIANCE ON 071221

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC

07/29/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC

07/29/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC

07/29/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC

07/29/2021:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC AND ANDREW ALDEN AAMODT

07/28/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC AND ANDREW ALDEN AAMODT

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON ANDREW ALDEN AAMODT 071221

07/15/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON ANDREW ALDEN AAMODT 071221

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION 070921

07/15/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION 070921

ADMIN ORDER: A-2021-13 EST AND IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM -DTD 042921

07/06/2021:ADMIN ORDER: A-2021-13 EST AND IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM -DTD 042921

HIGH PRIORITY NOTICE - ADMIN ORDER A-2021-13 DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM

07/06/2021:HIGH PRIORITY NOTICE - ADMIN ORDER A-2021-13 DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM

ADMIN NOTICE

07/06/2021:ADMIN NOTICE

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ANDREW ALDEN AAMODT

07/01/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ANDREW ALDEN AAMODT

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -FILED BY DEF, NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (AMENDED) FILED BY NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC AND ANDREW ALDEN AAMODT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEF NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF R GAVIN MACKINNON ESQ, JEREMY M BROWN ESQ OF THE LAW FIRM GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP AS COUNSEL FOR DEFS AND EMAIL DESIG orlpleadings@goldbergsegalla.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE AND RESPONSE TO DEF, NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION, INC. REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE AND RESPONSE TO DEF'S NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION, INC. FIRST SET OF INTERROGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLETION OR COMPLIANCE ON 071221

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ANDREW ALDEN AAMODT ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO NATURE COAST EMERGENCY MEDICAL FOUNDATION, INC ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number H 744495

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000537CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/1/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN MACYSZYN