This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 08/04/2020 at 07:19:04 (UTC).

CHESTER, EDWARD LEE, CHESTER, VERA THELMA Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CHESTER, EDWARD LEE, CHESTER, VERA THELMA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHESTER, EDWARD LEE

Decedent

CHESTER, VERA THELMA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to RECLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketReopen Civil Other closed on 6/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DTD 061220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketDRIVERS LICENSE COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketSUNTRUST BANK STATEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketAMENDED PET FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $50.00 Receipt Number H 685477

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $50.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH VERA THELMA CHESTER (ORIG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketADDITIONAL PARTY SUPPORTING AFDVT - MELBA HEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketADDITIONAL PARTY SUPPORTING AFDVT - MURIEL Y MAJOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketADDITIONAL PARTY SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT - MARY J BAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number H 659032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CP001328CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less