This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/01/2021 at 23:02:30 (UTC).

CHENOWETH, AFTON CHARLES VS DUDA, DANIEL ROBERT Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 CHENOWETH, AFTON CHARLES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DUDA, DANIEL ROBERT. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHENOWETH, AFTON CHARLES

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE I

DUDA, DANIEL ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HARPER, SHAQUANA CHIMERE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 030122 AT 9:00 VIA ZOOM W/ MEDIATOR STEPHEN G BRANNAN ESQ FILED BY PLNTF

10/20/2021:NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 030122 AT 9:00 VIA ZOOM W/ MEDIATOR STEPHEN G BRANNAN ESQ FILED BY PLNTF

ADMIN ORDER: A-2021-13 EST AND IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM -DTD 042921

09/10/2021:ADMIN ORDER: A-2021-13 EST AND IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM -DTD 042921

REQUEST FOR COPIES TO CO-DEF DANIEL DUDA RE ALEXANDER ORTHOPEDIC ASSOCIATES FILED BY DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

08/16/2021:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO CO-DEF DANIEL DUDA RE ALEXANDER ORTHOPEDIC ASSOCIATES FILED BY DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

08/10/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AMENDED ANSWERS TO DEF DANIEL ROBERT DUDA'S INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

07/28/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AMENDED ANSWERS TO DEF DANIEL ROBERT DUDA'S INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AMENDED ANSWERS TO DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

07/28/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AMENDED ANSWERS TO DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF DEF DANIEL ROBERT DUDA FILED BY PLNTF

07/27/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF DEF DANIEL ROBERT DUDA FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF DANIEL ROBERT DUDA FILED BY PLNTF

07/26/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF DANIEL ROBERT DUDA FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

07/26/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

07/20/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEF DANIEL ROBERT DUDA'S INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

07/20/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEF DANIEL ROBERT DUDA'S INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLNTFS INTERROGS FILED BY DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

07/06/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLNTFS INTERROGS FILED BY DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND CASE STATUS RPT

06/30/2021:NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND CASE STATUS RPT

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA -FILED BY DEF

06/24/2021:NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA -FILED BY DEF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

06/04/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

06/03/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

06/03/2021:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEF DANIEL ROBERT DUDA

06/01/2021:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEF DANIEL ROBERT DUDA

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 030122 AT 9:00 VIA ZOOM W/ MEDIATOR STEPHEN G BRANNAN ESQ FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMIN ORDER: A-2021-13 EST AND IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM -DTD 042921

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES TO CO-DEF DANIEL DUDA RE ALEXANDER ORTHOPEDIC ASSOCIATES FILED BY DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF AMENDED ANSWERS TO DEF DANIEL ROBERT DUDA'S INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF AMENDED ANSWERS TO DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF DEF DANIEL ROBERT DUDA FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF DANIEL ROBERT DUDA FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEF STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQEUST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT DANIEL ROBERT DUDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT DANIEL ROBERT DUDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, DANIEL ROBERT DUDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000195CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARPER , SHAQUANA CHIMERE