Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 19:31:11 (UTC).

CHANEY, MARK B VS CAMERA, ALICIA

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 CHANEY, MARK B filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against CAMERA, ALICIA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHANEY, MARK B

Respondent

CAMERA, ALICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

OZYJOWSKI, KAREN CONTEGIACOMO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $295.00 Receipt Number H 733395

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $295.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketANSWER & CROSSCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE KAREN C. OZYJOWSKI, ESQ. OBO RESPONDENT ALICIA CAMERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $295.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD ON ALICIA MARIE CAMERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR CIVIL INDIGENCY - INDIGENT PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER INVOLVING PARENTING ISSUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMB HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ALICIA CAMERA - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000611DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OZYJOWSKI, KAREN CONTEGIACOMO