This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 08/08/2020 at 16:21:07 (UTC).

CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS F VS JIM ZINGALE AS EXECUTIVE DIREC Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS F filed an Other lawsuit against JIM ZINGALE AS EXECUTIVE DIREC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS F

Defendants

SALLY L DANIEL AS TAX COLLECTO

JIM ZINGALE AS EXECUTIVE DIREC

JOHN C EMERSON AS PROPERTY APP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

FELICE, CARRIE NICOLE

SAVOCA, JOHN GARY

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD (FIRST REQUEST OF PLNTF) FILED BY DEF, JOHN C EMERSON AS HERNANDO COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

08/12/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD (FIRST REQUEST OF PLNTF) FILED BY DEF, JOHN C EMERSON AS HERNANDO COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEF, JOHN C EMERSON, HERNANDO COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

08/12/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEF, JOHN C EMERSON, HERNANDO COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

ANSWER FILED BY JOHN C EMERSON, HERNANDO COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

07/14/2020:ANSWER FILED BY JOHN C EMERSON, HERNANDO COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY JIM ZINGALE, AS EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

07/14/2020:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY JIM ZINGALE, AS EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOHN G SAVOCA ON BEHALF OF DEF, JIM ZINGALE, AS EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

07/13/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOHN G SAVOCA ON BEHALF OF DEF, JIM ZINGALE, AS EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CARRIE N FELICE ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF, SALLY L DANIEL, SOLELY IN HER CAPACITY AS TAX COLLECTOR OF HERNANDO COUNTY FLORIDA AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS hernandotc@hoganlawfirm.com

06/25/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CARRIE N FELICE ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF, SALLY L DANIEL, SOLELY IN HER CAPACITY AS TAX COLLECTOR OF HERNANDO COUNTY FLORIDA AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS hernandotc@hoganlawfirm.com

WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FILED BY CARRIE N FELICE

06/25/2020:WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FILED BY CARRIE N FELICE

WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FILED BY LOREN E LEVY, COUNSEL FOR DEF, JOHN C EMERSON, HERNANDO COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

06/24/2020:WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FILED BY LOREN E LEVY, COUNSEL FOR DEF, JOHN C EMERSON, HERNANDO COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT PROPERTY APPRAISER

04/15/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT PROPERTY APPRAISER

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT PROPERTY APPRAISER FILED BY PLAINTIFF

04/15/2020:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT PROPERTY APPRAISER FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JIM ZINGALE, AS THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE FL DOR

03/12/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JIM ZINGALE, AS THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE FL DOR

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SALLY L. DANIEL, AS TAX COLLECTOR

03/12/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SALLY L. DANIEL, AS TAX COLLECTOR

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOHN C. EMERSON, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER

03/12/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOHN C. EMERSON, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER

SUMMONS ISSUED JIM ZINGALE, AS THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE FL DOR

03/12/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED JIM ZINGALE, AS THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE FL DOR

SUMMONS ISSUED SALLY L. DANIEL, AS TAX COLLECTOR

03/12/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED SALLY L. DANIEL, AS TAX COLLECTOR

SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN C. EMERSON, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER

03/12/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN C. EMERSON, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER

COMPLAINT FILED

03/12/2020:COMPLAINT FILED

COVER SHEET

03/12/2020:COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY JOHN C EMERSON, HERNANDO COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY JIM ZINGALE, AS EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOHN G SAVOCA ON BEHALF OF DEF, JIM ZINGALE, AS EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF SALLY DANIEL, IN HER CAPACITY AS TAX COLLECTOR OF HERNANDO COUNTY, FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CARRIE N FELICE ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF, SALLY L DANIEL, SOLELY IN HER CAPACITY AS TAX COLLECTOR OF HERNANDO COUNTY FLORIDA AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS hernandotc@hoganlawfirm.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FILED BY CARRIE N FELICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS FILED BY LOREN E LEVY, COUNSEL FOR DEF, JOHN C EMERSON, HERNANDO COUNTY PROPERTY APPRAISER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT PROPERTY APPRAISER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT PROPERTY APPRAISER FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JIM ZINGALE, AS THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE FL DOR

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JIM ZINGALE, AS THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE FL DOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED SALLY L. DANIEL, AS TAX COLLECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JOHN C. EMERSON, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number H 674589

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000272CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS F is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELICE, CARRIE NICOLE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Savoca, John Gary