Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/05/2019 at 13:16:29 (UTC).

CECH, MELANIE VS NICHOL, JENNIFER

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 CECH, MELANIE filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against NICHOL, JENNIFER. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CECH, MELANIE

Defendant

NICHOL, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION FILED BY PLNTF

03/04/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - RESIDENTIAL EVICTION FILED BY PLNTF

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - DAMAGES FILED BY PLNTF

03/04/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - DAMAGES FILED BY PLNTF

FINAL JUDGMENT - EVICTION DTD 022719

03/04/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT - EVICTION DTD 022719

FINAL JUDGMENT - DAMAGES - $2200.00 AND COSTS $195.00, MAKING A TOTAL OF $2395.00 THAT SHALL BEAR INT AT THE LEGAL RATE PURSUANT TO SECITON 55.03 F.S. FOR WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE; PLNTF STILL NEEDS TO COMPLY W/ STATUTE RE SECURITY DEPOSIT DTD 030119

03/04/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT - DAMAGES - $2200.00 AND COSTS $195.00, MAKING A TOTAL OF $2395.00 THAT SHALL BEAR INT AT THE LEGAL RATE PURSUANT TO SECITON 55.03 F.S. FOR WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE; PLNTF STILL NEEDS TO COMPLY W/ STATUTE RE SECURITY DEPOSIT DTD 030119

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (COUNT II)/DEFAULT - ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST DEF, JENNIFER NICHOL

02/22/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT (COUNT II)/DEFAULT - ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST DEF, JENNIFER NICHOL

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (COUNT I)/DEFAULT - ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST DEF, JENNIFER NICHOL

02/22/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT (COUNT I)/DEFAULT - ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST DEF, JENNIFER NICHOL

MOTION DEFAULT/DEFAULT-EVICT (COUNT II) - AGAINST DEF, JENNIFER NICHOL (BLANK)

02/19/2019:MOTION DEFAULT/DEFAULT-EVICT (COUNT II) - AGAINST DEF, JENNIFER NICHOL (BLANK)

AFFIDAVIT OF DAMAGES

02/19/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF DAMAGES

MOTION DEFAULT/DEFAULT-EVICT (COUNT I) - AGAINST DEF, JENNIFER NICHOL (BLANK)

02/19/2019:MOTION DEFAULT/DEFAULT-EVICT (COUNT I) - AGAINST DEF, JENNIFER NICHOL (BLANK)

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

02/19/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

RETURN OF SERVICE - EVICTION SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON JENNIFER NICHOL (INDIVIDUALLY/PERSONALLY) AT 012419

02/19/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - EVICTION SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON JENNIFER NICHOL (INDIVIDUALLY/PERSONALLY) AT 012419

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - COPY OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, MAILED TO: JENNIFER NICHOL, ON 012819

01/28/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - COPY OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, MAILED TO: JENNIFER NICHOL, ON 012819

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JENNIFER NICHOL

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JENNIFER NICHOL

SUMMONS ISSUED JENNIFER NICHOL - BLANK

01/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED JENNIFER NICHOL - BLANK

PETITION FOR EVICTION (WITH 3 DAY NOTICE FROM LANDLORD TO TENANT - TERMINATION FOR FAILURE TO PAY RENT)

01/17/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION (WITH 3 DAY NOTICE FROM LANDLORD TO TENANT - TERMINATION FOR FAILURE TO PAY RENT)

COVER SHEET

01/17/2019:COVER SHEET

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT (COUNT II)/DEFAULT - ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST DEF, JENNIFER NICHOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT (COUNT I)/DEFAULT - ENTERED BY CLERK - AGAINST DEF, JENNIFER NICHOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION DEFAULT/DEFAULT-EVICT (COUNT II) - AGAINST DEF, JENNIFER NICHOL (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION DEFAULT/DEFAULT-EVICT (COUNT I) - AGAINST DEF, JENNIFER NICHOL (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - EVICTION SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON JENNIFER NICHOL (INDIVIDUALLY/PERSONALLY) AT 012419

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - COPY OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, MAILED TO: JENNIFER NICHOL, ON 012819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JENNIFER NICHOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number H 606353

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED JENNIFER NICHOL - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION (WITH 3 DAY NOTICE FROM LANDLORD TO TENANT - TERMINATION FOR FAILURE TO PAY RENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Case 272019CC000088CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less