Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 13:16:23 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS SACKIS, LAURA ANNE

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SACKIS, LAURA ANNE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

SACKIS, LAURA ANNE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: LAURA ANNE SACKIS

03/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: LAURA ANNE SACKIS

SUMMONS ISSUED LAURA ANNE SACKIS (BLANK)

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED LAURA ANNE SACKIS (BLANK)

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

03/14/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

COVER SHEET

03/14/2019:COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

03/14/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: LAURA ANNE SACKIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 617011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED LAURA ANNE SACKIS (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 272019CC000395CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less