Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/24/2021 at 18:22:00 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNE VS BARNETTE, ANTHONY J

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BARNETTE, ANTHONY J. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT and HITZEMANN, KURT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

HITZEMANN, KURT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNE

Defendant

BARNETTE, ANTHONY J

Spring Hill, FL 34609-4836

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $1873.44

03/01/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $1873.44

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO ANTHONY J BARNETTE (BLANK)

03/01/2021:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO ANTHONY J BARNETTE (BLANK)

COVER SHEET

03/01/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON ANTHONY J BARNETTE @ 031121

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ANTHONY J BARNETTE - PTC 050621 9:00AM CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 723655

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO ANTHONY J BARNETTE (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $1873.44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC000488SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON DRAGUTSKY