This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/02/2021 at 04:06:52 (UTC).

CATRAN, AMANDA Et Al VS SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 CATRAN, AMANDA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CATRAN, JOE

CATRAN, AMANDA

Defendant

SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOW, DAVID

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

07/09/2021:COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED TO SOUTHERN FIDELTY INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

07/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO SOUTHERN FIDELTY INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/09/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/09/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

INTERROGATORY

07/09/2021:INTERROGATORY

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

07/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT

07/09/2021:COMPLAINT

HIGH PRIORITY NOTICE ADMIN ORDER A-2021-13 DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM

07/14/2021:HIGH PRIORITY NOTICE ADMIN ORDER A-2021-13 DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM

ADMIN NOTICE

07/14/2021:ADMIN NOTICE

ORDER EST AND IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM -DTD 042921

07/14/2021:ORDER EST AND IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM -DTD 042921

ORDER EST AND IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM -DTD 042921

07/14/2021:ORDER EST AND IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM -DTD 042921

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 073021

08/06/2021:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 073021

MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALT MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY DEF

08/17/2021:MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALT MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY DEF

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO STAY INITIAL DISCOVERY PENDING OUTCOME OF MTN TO DISMISS FILED BY DEF

08/17/2021:MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO STAY INITIAL DISCOVERY PENDING OUTCOME OF MTN TO DISMISS FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

08/18/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO STAY INITIAL DISCOVERY PENDING OUTCOME OF MTN TO DISMISS FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALT MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 073021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EST AND IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM -DTD 042921

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EST AND IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM -DTD 042921

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMIN NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHIGH PRIORITY NOTICE ADMIN ORDER A-2021-13 DIFFERENTIATED ACT CIVIL CASE MGT SYSTEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO SOUTHERN FIDELTY INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000563CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/9/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southern Fidelity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Low, David, ESQ.