This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 19:31:47 (UTC).

CATALDI, MONICA DANIELLE VS HANNAH, TERENCE DEON

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 CATALDI, MONICA DANIELLE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HANNAH, TERENCE DEON. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBEE, DON JR and DON BARBEE JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARBEE, DON JR

DON BARBEE JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CATALDI, MONICA DANIELLE

Respondent

HANNAH, TERENCE DEON

Not Classified By Court

HANNAH, TERRY

HANNAH, TERRANCE DION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD 09/29/20 TERENCE D HANNAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - PET FTA - CASE DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING - INJUNCTION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY ORDER - DOM VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 9/30/2020 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge DON BARBEE JR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketWAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJ DOM VIOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020DR001677DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less