This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/29/2022 at 05:47:40 (UTC).

CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE CO VS HOME DEPOT USA INC

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE CO filed an Other lawsuit against HOME DEPOT USA INC. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE CO

Defendant

HOME DEPOT USA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABRAMENKO, STANISLAV

Defendant Attorney

WEISS, JEFFREY SCOTT

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

08/12/2021:COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HOME DEPOT USA INC (BLANK)

08/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HOME DEPOT USA INC (BLANK)

COVER SHEET

08/12/2021:COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR HOME DEPOT USA INC

08/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR HOME DEPOT USA INC

NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE (SUMMONS) SERVED ON HOME DEPOT, U.S.A., INC. 081621

08/18/2021:NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE (SUMMONS) SERVED ON HOME DEPOT, U.S.A., INC. 081621

COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

08/12/2021:COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

MOTION FILED TO ABATE FILED BY DEF

10/27/2021:MOTION FILED TO ABATE FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JEFFREY S WEISS ESQ AND ALEJANDRO FELCE ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND EMAIL DESIG jweiss@orlandolaw.net

10/27/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JEFFREY S WEISS ESQ AND ALEJANDRO FELCE ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND EMAIL DESIG jweiss@orlandolaw.net

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY W/I FIRM OF STAN ABRAMMENKO, ESQ., OBO PLNTF, CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY IN PLACE OF ROBERT G. MAY, III, ESQ., AND AMENDED NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIG gstcourtdocs@gspalaw.com

01/21/2022:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY W/I FIRM OF STAN ABRAMMENKO, ESQ., OBO PLNTF, CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY IN PLACE OF ROBERT G. MAY, III, ESQ., AND AMENDED NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIG gstcourtdocs@gspalaw.com

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

01/31/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

ORDER FILED (AGREED) OF DISMISSAL W/ PREJ -DTD 020922

02/09/2022:ORDER FILED (AGREED) OF DISMISSAL W/ PREJ -DTD 020922

ORDER FILED - AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJ -DTD 021022

02/10/2022:ORDER FILED - AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJ -DTD 021022

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED - AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/PREJ -DTD 021022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED (AGREED) OF DISMISSAL W/ PREJ -DTD 020922

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY W/I FIRM OF STAN ABRAMMENKO, ESQ., OBO PLNTF, CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY IN PLACE OF ROBERT G. MAY, III, ESQ., AND AMENDED NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIG gstcourtdocs@gspalaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JEFFREY S WEISS ESQ AND ALEJANDRO FELCE ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND EMAIL DESIG jweiss@orlandolaw.net

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FILED TO ABATE FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE (SUMMONS) SERVED ON HOME DEPOT, U.S.A., INC. 081621

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR HOME DEPOT USA INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO HOME DEPOT USA INC (BLANK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 750433

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CC000937CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFREY WEISS