This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/04/2019 at 18:16:32 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS TUBBS, ROSALEE V

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TUBBS, ROSALEE V. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

TUBBS, ROSALEE V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ, KARLA M

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON ROSALEE V TUBBS (INDIVIDUAL SERVICE) AT 032619

03/29/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON ROSALEE V TUBBS (INDIVIDUAL SERVICE) AT 032619

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS - ISSUED FOR: ROSALEE V TUBBS - PT 052019 AT 9:00AM IN CRTROOM B

03/15/2019:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS - ISSUED FOR: ROSALEE V TUBBS - PT 052019 AT 9:00AM IN CRTROOM B

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS ROSALEE V TUBBS

03/11/2019:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS ROSALEE V TUBBS

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

03/11/2019:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS LEGALPLEADINGS@POLLACKROSEN.COM

03/11/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS LEGALPLEADINGS@POLLACKROSEN.COM

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILING

03/11/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILING

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,578.89

03/11/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,578.89

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON ROSALEE V TUBBS (INDIVIDUAL SERVICE) AT 032619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS - ISSUED FOR: ROSALEE V TUBBS - PT 052019 AT 9:00AM IN CRTROOM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 615890

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS ROSALEE V TUBBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS LEGALPLEADINGS@POLLACKROSEN.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $2,578.89

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Case 272019SC000633SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less