This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 11/01/2021 at 16:04:49 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA VS SINGER, ROBIN S

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SINGER, ROBIN S. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT E and HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT E

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

SINGER, ROBIN S

Spring Hill, FL 34608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRUSS, RAMIRO GUSTAVO

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

06/18/2021:COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED 3069.35

06/18/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED 3069.35

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

06/18/2021:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

06/18/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS LegalPleadings@PollackRosen.com

06/18/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS LegalPleadings@PollackRosen.com

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

06/18/2021:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBIN S SINGER ~ BLANK

06/18/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBIN S SINGER ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ROBIN S SINGER - PTC 092921 AT 10:15 CRTRM B

06/28/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ROBIN S SINGER - PTC 092921 AT 10:15 CRTRM B

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON ROBIN S SINGER 063021 - PTC 092921 1015AM CRTRM B

07/01/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON ROBIN S SINGER 063021 - PTC 092921 1015AM CRTRM B

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

07/28/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY IN THE U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA, CHAPTER 7, CASE NO. 8:21-bk-03937 ON OR ABOUT 072921

07/29/2021:SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY IN THE U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA, CHAPTER 7, CASE NO. 8:21-bk-03937 ON OR ABOUT 072921

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY IN THE U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA, CHAPTER 7, CASE NO. 8:21-bk-03937 ON OR ABOUT 072921

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON ROBIN S SINGER 063021 - PTC 092921 1015AM CRTRM B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ROBIN S SINGER - PTC 092921 AT 10:15 CRTRM B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 743034

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBIN S SINGER ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS LegalPleadings@PollackRosen.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FILED 3069.35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC001530SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRUSS, RAMIRO GUSTAVO