This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/18/2019 at 18:19:02 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS DUNCAN, DEBRAH A

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DUNCAN, DEBRAH A. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

DUNCAN, DEBRAH A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ, KARLA M

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DEBRAH A DUNCAN - PTC 041819 AT 11:30 CRTRM B

03/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DEBRAH A DUNCAN - PTC 041819 AT 11:30 CRTRM B

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEBRAH A DUNCAN - BLANK

02/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEBRAH A DUNCAN - BLANK

MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

02/22/2019:MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS LegalPleadings@PollackRosen.com

02/22/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS LegalPleadings@PollackRosen.com

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

02/22/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3421.15

02/22/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3421.15

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DEBRAH A DUNCAN - PTC 041819 AT 11:30 CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 613031

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEBRAH A DUNCAN - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS LegalPleadings@PollackRosen.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3421.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Case 272019SC000520SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less