Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/17/2021 at 21:12:28 (UTC).

CAFFREY, KATHERINE A, PROCTOR, MARIANNE Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 CAFFREY, KATHERINE A, PROCTOR, MARIANNE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Decedent

CAFFREY, KATHERINE A

Not Classified By Court

PROCTOR, MARIANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

BUCK, DAVID ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $9.00 Receipt Number H 730978

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $9.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $9.00 Receipt Number H 730545

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $9.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION DTD 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMIT WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DTD 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF KATHERINE A. CAFFREY ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH OF KATHERINE A. CAFFREY ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT CONCERNING CRIMINAL HISTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO SEPARATE WRITING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH KATHERINE A. CAFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PR/DESIGNATION AGENT MARIANNE PROCTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION TESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 727718

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000407CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCK, DAVID ALLEN