This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 08/08/2020 at 06:56:31 (UTC).

BUSH, LILLIAN Et Al VS HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATES

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 BUSH, LILLIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATES. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WRIGHT, MARK H

BUSH, LILLIAN

Defendants

HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATES

SERENDIPITIOUS MOMENTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRIGHT, MARK HARRIS

Defendant Attorney

FISHER, ELIZABETH BENTON

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT SETTLEMENT TO DEF SERENDIPITIOUS MOMENTS INC

08/04/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT SETTLEMENT TO DEF SERENDIPITIOUS MOMENTS INC

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ELIZABETH B FISHER ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEFS AND DESIG OF EMAIL clwmail@nationwide.com

07/09/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ELIZABETH B FISHER ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEFS AND DESIG OF EMAIL clwmail@nationwide.com

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY - SPRING HILL IMAGING LLC

06/26/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY - SPRING HILL IMAGING LLC

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEF HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATE'S MEDICARE INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

06/18/2020:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEF HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATE'S MEDICARE INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEF HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATE'S INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

06/18/2020:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEF HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATE'S INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SERENDIPITIOUS MOMENTS INC

05/08/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: SERENDIPITIOUS MOMENTS INC

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF CORP REP OF DEF, HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATES PA ON 050520 AT 3:00 FILED BY PLNTF

03/19/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF CORP REP OF DEF, HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATES PA ON 050520 AT 3:00 FILED BY PLNTF

MOTION FILED TO STRIKE DEFS THIRD AFFIRM DEFENSE OR IN THE ALT, MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

03/17/2020:MOTION FILED TO STRIKE DEFS THIRD AFFIRM DEFENSE OR IN THE ALT, MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (SECOND) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

03/05/2020:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (SECOND) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FILED BY PLNTF

02/04/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE RE MEDICARE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

01/28/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE RE MEDICARE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY RE MEDICARE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

01/28/2020:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY RE MEDICARE TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

01/16/2020:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

01/16/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JJENNIFER K FORTE ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS clwmail@nationwide.com

01/16/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JJENNIFER K FORTE ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND DESIG OF EMAIL ADDRESS clwmail@nationwide.com

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

12/02/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATES PA ~ BLANK

12/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATES PA ~ BLANK

COVER SHEET

12/02/2019:COVER SHEET

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEF HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATES PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT SETTLEMENT TO DEF SERENDIPITIOUS MOMENTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLNTFS WAIVER OF OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF LILLIAN BUSH ON 073120 AT 10:00 VIA ZOOM FILED BY DEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY SERENDIPITOUS MOMENTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ELIZABETH B FISHER ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEFS AND DESIG OF EMAIL clwmail@nationwide.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD (SECOND) OF DEF, HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATES PA FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY - SPRING HILL IMAGING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEF HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATE'S MEDICARE INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEF HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATE'S INTERROGS FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 658623

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATES PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO HERNANDO HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATES PA ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001364CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERNANDO HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATES, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH BENTON FISHER