This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/02/2021 at 02:58:41 (UTC).

BURGESS, LEONARD VS CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 BURGESS, LEONARD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURGESS, LEONARD

Defendants

SLACUM, JUSTIN

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE LLC FK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIACO, JOSEPH FRANCIS

Defendant Attorney

LIEBOWITZ, DANIEL SIDNEY

 

Court Documents

MOTION FILED TO STRIKE DEF CHARTER COMMNICATIONS (DE) LLC'S AFFIRM DEFENSES TO PLNTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALT, MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

10/22/2021:MOTION FILED TO STRIKE DEF CHARTER COMMNICATIONS (DE) LLC'S AFFIRM DEFENSES TO PLNTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALT, MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

MOTION FILED TO STRIKE DEF JUSTIN SLACUM'S AFFIRM DEFENSES TO PLNTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALT, MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

10/22/2021:MOTION FILED TO STRIKE DEF JUSTIN SLACUM'S AFFIRM DEFENSES TO PLNTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALT, MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

MOTION FILED TO STRIKE DEF SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE LLC FKA BRIGHT HOUSE NETWORKS LLC'S AFFIRM DEFENSES TO PLNTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALT, MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

10/22/2021:MOTION FILED TO STRIKE DEF SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE LLC FKA BRIGHT HOUSE NETWORKS LLC'S AFFIRM DEFENSES TO PLNTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALT, MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT -FILED BY DEF, JASON SLACUM

10/19/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT -FILED BY DEF, JASON SLACUM

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT -FILED BY DEF, CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS (DE), LLC

10/19/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT -FILED BY DEF, CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS (DE), LLC

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEF, SPECTRUM SUNHINE STATE, LLC

10/19/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEF, SPECTRUM SUNHINE STATE, LLC

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (INITIAL) TO DEF SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE LLC FKA BRIGHT HOUSE NETWORKS LLC FILED BY PLNTF

09/29/2021:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (INITIAL) TO DEF SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE LLC FKA BRIGHT HOUSE NETWORKS LLC FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (INITIAL) TO DEF CHARTER COMMUNCIATIONS (DE) LLC FILED BY PLNTF

09/29/2021:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (INITIAL) TO DEF CHARTER COMMUNCIATIONS (DE) LLC FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS (DE) LLC FILED BY PLNTF

09/29/2021:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS (DE) LLC FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE LLC FKA BRIGHT HOUSE NETWORKS LLC FILED BY PLNTF

09/29/2021:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE LLC FKA BRIGHT HOUSE NETWORKS LLC FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (FIRST) TO DEF CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS (DE) LLC FILED BY PLNTF

09/29/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (FIRST) TO DEF CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS (DE) LLC FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (FIRST) TO DEF SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE LLC FKA BRIGHT HOUSE NETWORKS LLC FILED BY PLNTF

09/29/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (FIRST) TO DEF SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE LLC FKA BRIGHT HOUSE NETWORKS LLC FILED BY PLNTF

AMENDED COMPLAINT/PETITION

09/29/2021:AMENDED COMPLAINT/PETITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLNTFS FIRST INTERROGS FILED BY DEF JUSTIN SLACUM

09/22/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLNTFS FIRST INTERROGS FILED BY DEF JUSTIN SLACUM

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEF JUSTIN SLACUM

09/17/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEF JUSTIN SLACUM

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF JUSTIN SLACUM

09/17/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF JUSTIN SLACUM

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (UNVERIFIED) FILED BY DEF JUSTIN SLACUM

09/17/2021:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (UNVERIFIED) FILED BY DEF JUSTIN SLACUM

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

08/26/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FILED TO STRIKE DEF CHARTER COMMNICATIONS (DE) LLC'S AFFIRM DEFENSES TO PLNTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALT, MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FILED TO STRIKE DEF JUSTIN SLACUM'S AFFIRM DEFENSES TO PLNTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALT, MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FILED TO STRIKE DEF SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE LLC FKA BRIGHT HOUSE NETWORKS LLC'S AFFIRM DEFENSES TO PLNTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALT, MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT -FILED BY DEF, JASON SLACUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT -FILED BY DEF, CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS (DE), LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEF, SPECTRUM SUNHINE STATE, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (INITIAL) TO DEF SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE LLC FKA BRIGHT HOUSE NETWORKS LLC FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (INITIAL) TO DEF CHARTER COMMUNCIATIONS (DE) LLC FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS (DE) LLC FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO DEF SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE LLC FKA BRIGHT HOUSE NETWORKS LLC FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIIONS TO DEFENDANT, JUSTIN SLACUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCITON TO DEFENDANT, CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, JUSTIN SLACUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVIG INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, JUSTIN SLACUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000540CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/1/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE LLC FKA BRIGHT HOUSE NETWORKS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Charter Communications Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIEBOWITZ , DANIEL SIDNEY