Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/29/2021 at 21:03:14 (UTC).

BRYE, MARGARET H, BRYE, THOMAS D Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 BRYE, MARGARET H, BRYE, THOMAS D was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRYE, THOMAS D

Decedent

BRYE, MARGARET H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAY, DAVID JEFFREY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION DTD 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH OF MARGARET H. BRYE ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number H 729637

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number H 728685

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH MARGARET HAZEL BRYE (E-PORTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000442CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAY, DAVID JEFFREY